Name | Date of Birth | Date of Death | Role | Company | From | To | Loco Classes | Bio |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Billinton, Lawson Boskovsky | 04/02/1882 | 26/11/1954 | CME | LBSCR | 01/01/1912 | 31/12/1922 | LBSCR L 4-6-4T (1914) | Link |
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Visitor Statistics |
» 29 Online » 3192 Today » 4163 Yesterday » 16598 Week » 69614 Month » 189141 Year » 3215994 Total |
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023) (Free MySQL Counter) |
Name | Date of Birth | Date of Death | Role | Company | From | To | Loco Classes | Bio |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Billinton, Lawson Boskovsky | 04/02/1882 | 26/11/1954 | CME | LBSCR | 01/01/1912 | 31/12/1922 | LBSCR L 4-6-4T (1914) | Link |