Name | Date of Birth | Date of Death | Role | Company | From | To | Loco Classes | Bio |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivatt, Henry George | 04/05/1886 | 04/10/1976 | CME | LMS | 12/10/1945 | 31/12/1947 | LMS 2MT 2-6-0 (1946) LMS 2MT 2-6-2T (1946) LMS 4MT 2-6-0 (1947) |
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Visitor Statistics |
» 9 Online » 455 Today » 4397 Yesterday » 18258 Week » 71274 Month » 190801 Year » 3217654 Total |
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023) (Free MySQL Counter) |
Name | Date of Birth | Date of Death | Role | Company | From | To | Loco Classes | Bio |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivatt, Henry George | 04/05/1886 | 04/10/1976 | CME | LMS | 12/10/1945 | 31/12/1947 | LMS 2MT 2-6-0 (1946) LMS 2MT 2-6-2T (1946) LMS 4MT 2-6-0 (1947) |