Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80106 |
on |
22/10/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
on |
22/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80106 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80106 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|