Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 322 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14365 Week
» 79319 Month
» 281983 Year
» 3308836 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80102 |
on |
01/03/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80102 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
15/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
05/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80102 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Ringwood Goods yard |
|
|