Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 804 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18607 Week
» 71623 Month
» 191150 Year
» 3218003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80101 |
on |
07/02/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/02/1955 |
Southern Miscellany |
Commencing in mid-February diesel shunters commenced work in Brighton Top and Lower Goods Yards, Nos. 13092/3 being the present pair. It is understood that two diesels are now being used at Three Bridges. Nos. 13100/1 appeared at Norwood Junction on 26th February. No. 80101 was back in Brighton shops on 23rd February, and No. 80102 was nearly ready (due on 28th February). Nos. 80103/4 are due 15/3 and 30/3 and 80105 in April, completing the order. The next order is for fifteen to be numbered 80106-80130, and is believed to be the last for steam construction at Brighton. |
SLS/195503 |
26/03/1966 |
Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) |
Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). |
SLS/196605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/02/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80101 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80101 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Morriston |
|
|