Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 364 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18167 Week
» 71183 Month
» 190710 Year
» 3217563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80025 |
on |
13/12/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
67A |
|
Corkerhill (New) |
on |
13/12/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/08/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
on |
13/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/12/1951 |
Scottish Miscellany |
Of the B.R. 2-6-4T Nos. 80020-2 are at Kittybrewster, 80023/6 at Polmadie and 80024/5 at Corkerhill. Ivatt 2-6-0 43133 has arrived at Eastfield depot. Ex-L.M.S. Class 5 4-6-0s now work regularly over the West Highland line. During the New Year week V2 class engines worked frequently on the Edinburgh-Glasgow turns. Towards the end of December Class J39 64750 was noted being towed to Cowlairs Works after a 'pitch-in.' Regular Sunday cheap day excursion tickets are now being given from Glasgow to more distant towns, e.g., by 7.15 a.m. to Grantown-on-Spey West; Hawick by 9.40 a.m. |
SLS/195203 |
12/07/1952 |
BR Standard Clans |
The 'Clan' class engine is not appearing so regularly on the Stranraer road. Recently an ex-LM 5XP had to be assisted by ex-CR 18in. 0-6-0 from Girvan to Stranraer, the small engine doing most of the work, and ran almost to time. On 19/7 the 8.49 from Milngavie appeared for one day only in a new role. Made up of nine corridor vehicles hauled by 61067 (B1) it became a through train to London (K.X.). The S.O.C.T.A.C. special Craigendoran-Sheffield is worked by both B1 and ex-LM '5' 4-6-0 to Edinburgh. The Lauder branch is to be kept open meantime and class 2 2-6-0 engines are in use. Several lines are expecting the economy axe to fall shortly, both in Angus and the Coalbum and Strathaven branches in Lanarkshire. On 2/8 the 1.40 p.m. S.O. Glasgow to Largs, failed at Dalry. No. 40629 was taken from the train, which went forward half an hour late behind 90505. J37 64577 ran through the buffer stops at Leuchars on 29/7 and lay alongside the roadway until removed late that evening. Traffic working on the Ayr to Stranraer section during the summer has been fairly stereotyped. Trains to Girvan were worked by LM Compound, class 2 4-4-0, LM 2-6-4T and B.R. 2-6-4T (42206 and 80025 respectively), trains to Stranraer were generally hauled by ex-LM Class 5 4-6-0, with an occasional 5XP or Patriot, and a 'Clan' most days. There was one only ex-LM 2-6-0 seen on this section on goods work. Generally ex-LM 4-6-0 class 5 dealt with this traffic. Ex-CR 0-6-0T 56234 was pier pilot at Stranraer. 'Patriot' was always 45518 Bradshaw. |
SLS/195210 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80025 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
24/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80025 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane |
|
|