Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80021 |
on |
10/11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
Company History |
BR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
Mon 10/11/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/07/1964 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
10/11/1951 |
67D |
|
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
67A |
|
Corkerhill |
4w/e |
29/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/07/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
on |
10/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
4w/e |
29/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/07/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/12/1951 |
Scottish Miscellany |
Of the B.R. 2-6-4T Nos. 80020-2 are at Kittybrewster, 80023/6 at Polmadie and 80024/5 at Corkerhill. Ivatt 2-6-0 43133 has arrived at Eastfield depot. Ex-L.M.S. Class 5 4-6-0s now work regularly over the West Highland line. During the New Year week V2 class engines worked frequently on the Edinburgh-Glasgow turns. Towards the end of December Class J39 64750 was noted being towed to Cowlairs Works after a 'pitch-in.' Regular Sunday cheap day excursion tickets are now being given from Glasgow to more distant towns, e.g., by 7.15 a.m. to Grantown-on-Spey West; Hawick by 9.40 a.m. |
SLS/195203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80021 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
13/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80021 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|