Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80019 |
on |
20/10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
Company History |
BR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
Sun 20/10/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 19/03/1967 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/10/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. |
SLS/195112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80019 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
13/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
19/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80019 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|