Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 534 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18337 Week
» 71353 Month
» 190880 Year
» 3217733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78053 |
m/e |
11/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78053 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
27/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (65J) |
|
|
30/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78053 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Bo'ness |
|
|