Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2574 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15980 Week
» 68996 Month
» 188523 Year
» 3215376 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78024 |
m/e |
05/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1961 |
Millhouses closure |
Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). |
SLS/196203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78024 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78024 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|