Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78005 |
on |
24/02/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78005 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
28/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78005 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|