Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76108 |
on |
10/08/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76108 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76108 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|