Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17173 Week
» 70189 Month
» 189716 Year
» 3216569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76103 |
on |
21/06/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76103 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (66F) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
17/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76103 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|