Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1735 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15141 Week
» 68157 Month
» 187684 Year
» 3214537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76066 |
m/e |
07/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
on |
30/07/1956 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
14/09/1964 |
TOSTORE |
70B |
Feltham |
4w/e |
18/01/1965 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
05/07/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76066 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
05/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76066 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|