|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/03/1955 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76045 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
||
22/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
21/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
30/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) | ||
10/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76045 | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |