|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 13/11/1945 | 30/11/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1946 | 11/06/1946 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1948 | 27/03/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60982 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1951 | 16/03/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1951 | 23/10/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1953 | 01/05/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1954 | 14/01/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29536 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1956 | 30/10/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1958 | 18/12/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1961 | 19/09/1961 | 20 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
08/07/1962 | York South MPD | Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. | SLS/196208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/06/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3694 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1935 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
13/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1945. Dep: 30/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 882 but not taken up | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 11/06/1946. | ||
06/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 982 | ||
27/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1948. Dep: 27/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60982 |
||
06/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 16/03/1951. | ||
22/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1951. Dep: 23/10/1951. | ||
05/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1953. Dep: 01/05/1953. | ||
19/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1954. Dep: 14/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29536 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
01/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 30/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1958. Dep: 18/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
31/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1961. Dep: 19/09/1961. | ||
05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60982 from York (North) (50A) | ||
16/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |