|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/04/1945 | 18/06/1945 | 54 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2921 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60981 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1951 | 22/02/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1953 | 13/07/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28059 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1955 | 10/08/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1957 | 07/08/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1958 | 01/08/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1959 | 04/05/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1959 | 28/08/1959 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29387 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1961 | 06/06/1961 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1962 | 08/09/1962 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/03/1954 | York Excursions | On 20/3/54 three excursion trains were run from York to Warrington for an important Rugby League match, the first train travelling via Leeds and the following two via Normanton; they were hauled respectively by 61224, 61084 an 61176 (all 50A). On 27/3/54 61224 (50A) worked the York portion of a North Eastern Region special dining excursion for the Grand National at Aintree, leaving York at 8.45 a.m. On 28/4/54 43133 (65A) was noted at York about 2.30 p.m. working a train of empties from Hull to Heaton. 60007 (34A) failed at Thirsk on 23/4/54 whilst working the Up Tees-Tyne Pullman, 9.25 a.m. Newcastle to King's Cross. It was replaced by 60981, the York south end pilot, which ran out light to Thirsk with the minimum of delay. In the evening 60007 was hauled into York shed by 61035 (50B). |
SLS/195406 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/04/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3693 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1929 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1945. Dep: 18/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 881 but not taken up | ||
01/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. | ||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 981 | ||
12/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2921 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60981 |
||
23/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1951. Dep: 22/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
04/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1953. Dep: 13/07/1953. | ||
19/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28059 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 10/08/1955. | ||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1957. Dep: 07/08/1957. | ||
30/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1958. Dep: 01/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1959. Dep: 04/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29387 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1961. Dep: 06/06/1961. | ||
07/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962. | ||
02/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1962. Dep: 08/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
15/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60981 from York (North) (50A) | ||
22/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |