|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/04/1943 | 09/04/1943 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1945 | 03/02/1945 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1945 | 22/11/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1946 | 15/03/1946 | 52 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1948 | 12/02/1949 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2934 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60967 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1950 | 29/07/1950 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/02/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1951 | 12/09/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1953 | 09/09/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1956 | 03/01/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29536 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1958 | 07/11/1958 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1959 | 18/03/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1960 | 15/02/1960 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1961 | 20/04/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29382 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1961 | 05/05/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/03/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3679 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1907 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1943. Dep: 09/04/1943. | ||
01/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945. | ||
08/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1945. Dep: 22/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 867 but not taken up | ||
23/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1946. Dep: 15/03/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 967 | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
29/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1948. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2934 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60967 |
||
24/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. | ||
07/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950. | ||
26/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. | ||
10/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 12/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1953. Dep: 09/09/1953. | ||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
16/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1956. Dep: 03/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29536 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
13/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1959. Dep: 18/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/02/1960. Dep: 15/02/1960. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
30/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. | ||
27/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29382 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1961. Dep: 05/05/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
10/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60967 from York (North) (50A) | ||
19/02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |