|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1946 | 11/06/1946 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1948 | 17/04/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60966 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1949 | 19/01/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 10510 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1950 | 29/08/1950 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1951 | 19/07/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1953 | 09/02/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1953 | 22/12/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1955 | 06/01/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1958 | 17/04/1958 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1960 | 11/11/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1961 | 04/05/1961 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1962 | 11/08/1962 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/03/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3678 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1906 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 866 but not taken up | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 11/06/1946. | ||
13/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 966 | ||
09/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60966 |
||
13/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1949. Dep: 19/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10510 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
29/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 29/08/1950. | ||
12/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 19/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
12/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. | ||
01/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1953. Dep: 09/02/1953. | ||
08/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
24/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
22/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1955. Dep: 06/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
13/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
04/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1958. Dep: 17/04/1958. | ||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
28/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1960. Dep: 11/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
28/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1961. Dep: 04/05/1961. | ||
25/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1962. Dep: 11/08/1962. | ||
11/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60966 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |