|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3142 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60960 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1951 | 07/02/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1952 | 20/03/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1952 | 19/12/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1954 | 05/11/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1956 | 13/09/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1957 | 09/04/1957 | 20 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1959 | 26/02/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1960 | 14/12/1960 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1961 | 08/11/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1962 | 27/01/1962 | 20 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1962 | First Gresley V2\'s condemned | The first inroads were made to the famous Gresley Class V2 2-6-2 locos. when 60850 of Doncaster (36A), 60960 of Thornaby (51L) and 60977 of York (50A) were simultaneously condemned during February. The latter was one of the four locos. involved in the Connington accident last December and was damaged beyond repair. | SLS/196205 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/11/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3672 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1899 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 860 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 960 | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3142 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60960 |
||
08/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1951. Dep: 07/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1952. Dep: 20/03/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
21/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1952. Dep: 19/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1956. Dep: 13/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1957. Dep: 09/04/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1959. Dep: 26/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
06/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1960. Dep: 14/12/1960. | ||
08/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1961. Dep: 08/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
08/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 27/01/1962. | ||
26/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60960 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
07/03/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |