|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 956 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1948 | 12/05/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60956 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1950 | 18/08/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2927 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1952 | 19/01/1952 | 13 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1952 | 15/05/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 29410 (Diagram 109) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1952 | 03/10/1952 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1954 | 12/08/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29411 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1956 | 02/05/1956 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1956 | 01/01/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1958 | 05/12/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1959 | 18/09/1959 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 28071 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1959 | 18/12/1959 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3668 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1895 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. | ||
18/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
26/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 856 but not taken up | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 956 |
||
19/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60956 |
||
19/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1950. Dep: 18/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2927 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1952. Dep: 19/01/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
21/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29410 (Diagram 109) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
||
16/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1952. Dep: 03/10/1952. | ||
10/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1954. Dep: 12/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29411 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1956. Dep: 02/05/1956. | ||
19/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1956. Dep: 01/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28071 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60956 from New England (34E) | ||
11/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |