|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3087 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60954 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1951 | 21/08/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1953 | 23/05/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1954 | 02/12/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1958 | 29/10/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1959 | 15/04/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1961 | 17/03/1961 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28084 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1961 | 17/04/1961 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1962 | 23/03/1962 | 59 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3666 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1893 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 854 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 954 | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. | ||
16/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3087 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60954 |
||
04/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 21/08/1951. | ||
28/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. | ||
01/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 02/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1958. Dep: 29/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 15/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28084 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1961. Dep: 17/04/1961. | ||
24/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1962. Dep: 23/03/1962. | ||
18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60954 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |