|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1944 | 06/05/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1947 | 22/10/1947 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29387 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1949 | 18/01/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60950 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1950 | 27/01/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1950 | 28/08/1950 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1951 | 20/03/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1952 | 06/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1953 | 11/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1954 | 03/06/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1954 | 06/07/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1954 | 26/07/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1956 | 20/07/1956 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Steam turbine on |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1958 | 08/08/1958 | 52 days | General | Steam turbine off Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1958 | 25/08/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1960 | 22/09/1960 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1960 | 04/10/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1961 | 09/12/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1961 | 12/12/1961 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1962 | 12/01/1962 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1962 | 06/02/1962 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1962 | 25/05/1962 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3652 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1889 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944. | ||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 850 but not taken up | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 950 | ||
02/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1947. Dep: 22/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29387 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1949. Dep: 18/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60950 |
||
24/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 27/01/1950. | ||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 28/08/1950. | ||
10/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1951. Dep: 20/03/1951. | ||
07/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1952. Dep: 06/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953. | ||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 03/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 06/07/1954. | ||
21/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/07/1954. Dep: 26/07/1954. | ||
07/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 20/07/1956. Work undertaken: Steam turbine on |
||
29/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
18/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1958. Dep: 08/08/1958. Work undertaken: Steam turbine off Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/08/1958. Dep: 25/08/1958. | ||
15/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1960. Dep: 22/09/1960. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
29/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1960. Dep: 04/10/1960. | ||
13/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
11/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1961. Dep: 12/12/1961. | ||
03/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1962. Dep: 12/01/1962. | ||
19/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1962. Dep: 06/02/1962. | ||
11/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1962. Dep: 25/05/1962. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60950 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |