|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60949 |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/12/1950 | 15/12/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1951 | 25/09/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1953 | 11/02/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1953 | 27/02/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1954 | 19/11/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/03/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1956 | 01/08/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1958 | 19/11/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1959 | 13/04/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1961 | 04/03/1961 | 34 days | General | Smith speedometer fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/06/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3651 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1888 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
09/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 849 but not taken up | ||
30/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 949 | ||
13/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60949 |
||
11/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950. | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
23/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951. | ||
24/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951. | ||
15/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953. | ||
25/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1953. Dep: 27/02/1953. | ||
21/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. | ||
14/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1956. Dep: 01/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1958. Dep: 19/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1959. Dep: 13/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer fitted |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60949 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
23/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |