|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1943 | 24/06/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3084 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 50 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/09/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2915 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60932 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1952 | 07/03/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1954 | 29/07/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1954 | 09/08/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1957 | 01/03/1957 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1957 | 05/03/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1958 | 17/09/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1958 | 06/10/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1959 | 02/03/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1959 | 18/11/1959 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1961 | 02/03/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
11/10/1964 | Swindon Works (C shop area) | Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/10/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3659 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1891 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. | ||
12/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1943. Dep: 24/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3084 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 832 but not taken up | ||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 932 | ||
08/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2915 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60932 |
||
18/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/02/1952. Dep: 07/03/1952. | ||
01/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1954. Dep: 29/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1954. Dep: 09/08/1954. | ||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 01/03/1957. | ||
04/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 05/03/1957. | ||
02/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
06/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 17/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
25/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1958. Dep: 06/10/1958. | ||
26/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1959. Dep: 18/11/1959. | ||
23/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1961. Dep: 02/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60932 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |