|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1947 | 14/08/1947 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1949 | 29/01/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60930 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1949 | 16/02/1949 | 9 days | Special | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1949 | 25/11/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1951 | 10/12/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1955 | 28/10/1955 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1957 | 03/01/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1958 | 18/06/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1960 | 05/04/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1960 | 27/04/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1961 | 03/02/1961 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1961 | 22/04/1961 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1961 | 30/06/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/07/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3657 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1889 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
15/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
20/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 830 but not taken up | ||
02/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 930 | ||
09/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/07/1947. Dep: 14/08/1947. | ||
08/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1949. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60930 |
||
08/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 08/02/1949. Dep: 16/02/1949. | ||
22/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1949. Dep: 25/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 10/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
21/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 28/10/1955. | ||
06/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. | ||
28/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1958. Dep: 18/06/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1960. Dep: 05/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1960. Dep: 27/04/1960. | ||
30/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 03/02/1961. | ||
11/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/04/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961. | ||
21/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1961. Dep: 30/06/1961. | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60930 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |