|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1947 | 18/08/1947 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8933 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1949 | 24/11/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9171 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60921 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1951 | 03/10/1951 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1953 | 20/08/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1955 | 25/07/1955 | 4 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1957 | 05/12/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1958 | 12/07/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1961 | 24/02/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 23 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/10/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4892 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1870 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. | ||
22/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 821 but not taken up | ||
23/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 921 | ||
29/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 18/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8933 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1949. Dep: 24/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9171 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60921 |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1951. Dep: 03/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1953. Dep: 20/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/07/1955. Dep: 25/07/1955. | ||
15/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1957. Dep: 05/12/1957. | ||
05/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1961. Dep: 24/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60921 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |