|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1942 | 09/05/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1948 | 16/02/1948 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E912 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1949 | 30/05/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60912 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1950 | 05/04/1950 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1952 | 12/02/1952 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29399 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1956 | 19/04/1956 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1958 | 10/06/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1959 | 29/05/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1960 | 30/06/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1960 | 07/07/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1960 | 09/11/1960 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1961 | 25/10/1961 | 59 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/05/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4883 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1843 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. | ||
29/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. | ||
01/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 812 but not taken up | ||
10/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 912 | ||
22/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1948. Dep: 16/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E912 |
||
13/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1949. Dep: 30/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60912 |
||
31/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 12/02/1952. | ||
24/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29399 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1956. Dep: 19/04/1956. | ||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 10/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
28/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1959. Dep: 29/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 30/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1960. Dep: 07/07/1960. | ||
30/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/09/1960. Dep: 09/11/1960. | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
28/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1961. Dep: 25/10/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60912 from New England (34E) | ||
14/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |