|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/11/1941 | 20/12/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9545 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Thirsk derailment |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1947 | 26/07/1947 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1949 | 28/01/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3499 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60907 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1951 | 28/11/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1953 | 12/11/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 02/11/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1955 | 14/12/1955 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1958 | 27/08/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1959 | 25/02/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1960 | 12/05/1960 | 65 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1961 | 11/05/1961 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1962 | 28/05/1962 | 43 days | Light Casual | Welding in cylinder block tried but did not hold so repair not completed and locomotive condemned |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/04/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4878 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1838 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
10/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. | ||
22/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9545 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 807 but not taken up | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Thirsk derailment |
||
10/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 907 | ||
25/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947. | ||
19/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3499 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60907 |
||
25/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 28/11/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1953. Dep: 12/11/1953. | ||
17/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 02/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1955. Dep: 14/12/1955. | ||
17/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1958. Dep: 27/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1959. Dep: 25/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1960. Dep: 12/05/1960. | ||
14/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1961. Dep: 11/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1962. Dep: 28/05/1962. Work undertaken: Welding in cylinder block tried but did not hold so repair not completed and locomotive condemned |
||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
28/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60907 from York (North) (50A) |