|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1941 | 27/09/1941 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1943 | 24/04/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1947 | 16/07/1947 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1947 | 23/12/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1948 | 30/01/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E875 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1949 | 31/08/1949 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29382 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60875 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1949 | 05/01/1950 | 57 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1951 | 15/11/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1953 | 29/07/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29397 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1955 | 05/05/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1957 | 26/06/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1958 | 02/09/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1959 | 22/05/1959 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1960 | 27/05/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1962 | 07/02/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/07/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4846 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1901 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. | ||
06/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941. | ||
20/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943. | ||
15/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 775 but not taken up | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 875 | ||
05/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1947. Dep: 16/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1947. Dep: 23/12/1947. | ||
19/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E875 |
||
14/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1949. Dep: 31/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29382 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60875 |
||
10/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1949. Dep: 05/01/1950. | ||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 15/11/1951. | ||
29/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1953. Dep: 29/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29397 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1955. Dep: 05/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
22/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1957. Dep: 26/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1958. Dep: 02/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/04/1959. Dep: 22/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
29/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 27/05/1960. | ||
07/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/02/1962. Dep: 07/02/1962. | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
05/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60875 from Doncaster (36A) |