|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 10 days | Unclassified | Named KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1940 | 16/11/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1944 | 26/02/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1948 | 25/02/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E872 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1950 | 02/06/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3388 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60872 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1952 | 29/05/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1954 | 13/05/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1956 | 03/08/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1958 | 30/07/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1959 | 11/06/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1961 | 08/07/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1961 | 02/08/1961 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/04/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4843 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1898 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. Work undertaken: Named KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY |
||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. | ||
12/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940. | ||
17/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. | ||
12/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944. | ||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 772 but not taken up | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 872 | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1948. Dep: 25/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E872 |
||
21/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1950. Dep: 02/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3388 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60872 |
||
08/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. | ||
04/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1952. Dep: 29/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 13/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 03/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1958. Dep: 30/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1959. Dep: 11/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
29/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1961. Dep: 02/08/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60872 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
29/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |