|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1941 | 17/05/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1947 | 22/09/1947 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1949 | 21/10/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3144 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60857 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1951 | 09/03/1951 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1951 | 09/01/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1953 | 01/12/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1955 | 20/07/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1957 | 30/05/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29542 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1959 | 24/12/1959 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/05/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4828 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1798 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. | ||
26/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
12/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941. | ||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
16/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. | ||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
20/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 757 but not taken up | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 857 | ||
22/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. | ||
14/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1947. Dep: 22/09/1947. | ||
12/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1949. Dep: 21/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3144 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60857 |
||
05/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951. | ||
09/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1951. Dep: 09/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1953. Dep: 01/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1955. Dep: 20/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1957. Dep: 30/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29542 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/09/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
17/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60857 from Doncaster (36A) |