|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 13/03/1940 | 18/03/1940 | 6 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1942 | 16/12/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1943 | 02/02/1943 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 26 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 856 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3140 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60856 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1951 | 23/04/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1952 | 20/02/1952 | 9 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1953 | 17/06/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1953 | 30/09/1953 | 80 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1953 | 12/10/1953 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1954 | 11/08/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1954 | 17/12/1954 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1955 | 11/11/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1956 | 17/01/1956 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1957 | 31/07/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1957 | 03/01/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1958 | 23/01/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1958 | 05/02/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1958 | 13/08/1958 | 111 days | Heavy Casual | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1959 | 24/02/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1960 | 05/01/1961 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1961 | 10/02/1961 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1961 | 05/12/1961 | 36 days | Light Casual | New right hand cylinder |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1963 | 18/01/1963 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
11/10/1964 | Swindon Works (C shop area) | Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/05/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4827 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1797 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
13/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1940. Dep: 18/03/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
26/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1942. Dep: 16/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1943. Dep: 02/02/1943. | ||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 756 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 856 |
||
16/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3140 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60856 |
||
12/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1951. Dep: 23/04/1951. | ||
12/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1952. Dep: 20/02/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
27/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. | ||
13/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1953. Dep: 17/06/1953. | ||
13/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1953. Dep: 30/09/1953. | ||
01/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1953. Dep: 12/10/1953. | ||
09/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 11/08/1954. | ||
06/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954. | ||
08/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1955. Dep: 11/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 17/01/1956. | ||
31/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 31/07/1957. | ||
28/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1958. Dep: 23/01/1958. | ||
27/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1958. Dep: 05/02/1958. | ||
25/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/04/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1959. Dep: 24/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1960. Dep: 05/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1961. Dep: 10/02/1961. | ||
31/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1961. Dep: 05/12/1961. Work undertaken: New right hand cylinder |
||
15/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1963. Dep: 18/01/1963. | ||
25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60856 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |