|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 27/06/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9232 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 849 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1948 | 09/08/1948 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2948 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60849 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1949 | 11/11/1949 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1950 | 29/09/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1951 | 18/12/1951 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1952 | 04/12/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1954 | 14/12/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1956 | 18/01/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1958 | 04/09/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1959 | 21/04/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/03/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4820 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1790 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. | ||
11/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942. | ||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9232 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 749 but not taken up | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 849 |
||
27/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 09/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2948 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60849 |
||
30/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949. | ||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 18/12/1951. | ||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1954. Dep: 14/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1956. Dep: 18/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1959. Dep: 21/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/04/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
12/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60849 from Doncaster (36A) |