|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1940 | 05/10/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/12/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1948 | 12/01/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60846 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1949 | 25/11/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1950 | 19/01/1951 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1952 | 27/02/1952 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1952 | 24/11/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 29420 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1954 | 25/10/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1954 | 05/11/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1957 | 02/07/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1958 | 04/07/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1960 | 18/02/1961 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1961 | 29/04/1961 | 33 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1961 | 28/09/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1962 | 10/05/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28066 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1962 | 29/05/1962 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1962 | 28/06/1962 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1963 | 31/07/1963 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1963 | 12/10/1963 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) | March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/02/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4817 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1787 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940. | ||
26/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
14/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 746 but not taken up | ||
29/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 846 | ||
23/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
06/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 12/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60846 |
||
08/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 25/11/1949. | ||
13/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 19/01/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
19/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 27/02/1952. | ||
28/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1952. Dep: 24/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29420 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
24/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1954. Dep: 25/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954. | ||
27/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 02/07/1957. | ||
30/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 04/07/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
27/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
15/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1960. Dep: 18/02/1961. | ||
28/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1961. Dep: 29/04/1961. | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. | ||
02/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1962. Dep: 10/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28066 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
22/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1962. Dep: 29/05/1962. | ||
13/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1962. Dep: 28/06/1962. | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1963. Dep: 31/07/1963. | ||
27/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1963. Dep: 12/10/1963. | ||
19/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60846 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |