|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 31/12/1937 | 05/01/1938 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1938 | 21/02/1938 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1938 | 25/05/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1939 | 31/10/1939 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1940 | 01/11/1940 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1942 | 13/12/1942 | 35 days | General | Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3053 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 15/06/1945 | 18/06/1945 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/07/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1948 | 09/04/1948 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60822 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1949 | 29/09/1949 | 58 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1950 | 08/11/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1951 | 31/10/1951 | 16 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1953 | 08/05/1953 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1954 | 23/09/1954 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 26 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/01/1956 | 09/03/1956 | 44 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1956 | 15/10/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1957 | 19/06/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1958 | 12/09/1958 | 46 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1959 | 13/11/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1962 | 07/02/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1964 | 04/04/1964 | 52 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1964 | 07/04/1964 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/1964 | 07/1964 | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | Leeds Area | Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). | SLS/194601 |
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
01/02/1964 | Branch line news (Erecting Shop) | Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4793 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1720 Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
31/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1937. Dep: 05/01/1938. | ||
31/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1938. Dep: 21/02/1938. | ||
23/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 25/05/1938. | ||
09/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
18/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. | ||
09/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1939. Dep: 31/10/1939. | ||
30/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1940. Dep: 01/11/1940. | ||
09/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1942. Dep: 13/12/1942. Work undertaken: Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
28/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3053 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. | ||
15/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1945. Dep: 18/06/1945. | ||
12/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
07/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
30/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 722 | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 822 | ||
17/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 09/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60822 |
||
03/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 29/09/1949. | ||
05/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 08/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 31/10/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
15/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 08/05/1953. | ||
06/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1954. Dep: 23/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1956. Dep: 09/03/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 15/10/1956. | ||
16/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1957. Dep: 19/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/07/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
25/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. | ||
12/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1962. Dep: 07/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
13/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1964. Dep: 04/04/1964. | ||
06/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1964. Dep: 07/04/1964. | ||
07/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/07/1964. Dep: ?/07/1964. | ||
07/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60822 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |