|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/06/1938 | 24/06/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1939 | 08/04/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1946 | 11/05/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 720 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1948 | 04/04/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3445 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60820 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1950 | 14/04/1950 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 9545 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1952 | 25/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29401 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1955 | 24/12/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1956 | 02/03/1956 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1957 | 24/12/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1958 | 05/11/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1959 | 18/12/1959 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1961 | 20/09/1961 | 9 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/11/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4791 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1718 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1938. Dep: 24/06/1938. | ||
25/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939. | ||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
14/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. | ||
23/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. | ||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 720 |
||
03/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1948. Dep: 04/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3445 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60820 |
||
11/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
02/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9545 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
20/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1952. Dep: 25/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29401 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
01/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1956. Dep: 02/03/1956. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
24/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
19/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
21/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1957. Dep: 24/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1958. Dep: 05/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
18/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959. | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 20/09/1961. | ||
20/06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
20/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60820 from New England (34E) |