|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/11/1937 | 10/12/1937 | 38 days | Unclassified | Cylinders rebored |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1938 | 19/07/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1948 | 19/02/1948 | 35 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E815 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1949 | 11/07/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60815 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1951 | 23/10/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1952 | 24/09/1952 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1953 | 17/12/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1955 | 20/09/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1957 | 20/08/1957 | 62 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1959 | 29/10/1959 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1960 | 07/06/1960 | 83 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1961 | Leicester GC | V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/10/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4786 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1713 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
03/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1937. Dep: 10/12/1937. Work undertaken: Cylinders rebored |
||
15/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/07/1938. Dep: 19/07/1938. | ||
01/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. | ||
09/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. | ||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. | ||
20/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
02/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 715 but not taken up | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. | ||
11/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 815 | ||
16/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1948. Dep: 19/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E815 |
||
25/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1949. Dep: 11/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60815 |
||
09/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
10/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1951. Dep: 23/10/1951. | ||
01/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952. | ||
23/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. | ||
16/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1953. Dep: 17/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 20/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
20/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1957. Dep: 20/08/1957. | ||
17/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
08/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
24/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. | ||
31/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. | ||
25/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
07/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/09/1959. Dep: 29/10/1959. | ||
17/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1960. Dep: 07/06/1960. | ||
05/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60815 from Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
07/09/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |