|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/05/1938 | 18/05/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2892 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1947 | 20/02/1947 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1948 | 08/06/1948 | 33 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60814 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1950 | 29/03/1950 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 3109 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1950 | 19/09/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1953 | 16/02/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1954 | 11/05/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1955 | 21/03/1955 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1955 | 25/01/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1956 | 08/11/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29436 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1957 | 17/12/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1958 | 10/09/1958 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1960 | 02/06/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1960 | 15/06/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1960 | 09/07/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1961 | 28/09/1961 | 50 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/12/1942 | N.E. Area engines in Dundee | N.E. Area engines now visit Dundee fairly often, 'C.7's' 716 and 714 noted 12/12 and 19/12, and 'B.16' 931 on 25/12. 'V.2' 3667 worked 9.55 a.m, Edinburgh-Aberdeen on 25/12. | SLS/194302 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/10/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4785 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1712 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1938. Dep: 18/05/1938. | ||
01/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. | ||
26/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2892 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 714 | ||
15/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 814 | ||
07/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 20/02/1947. | ||
07/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1948. Dep: 08/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60814 |
||
11/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1950. Dep: 29/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3109 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 19/09/1950. | ||
03/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
05/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) | ||
25/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
11/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 16/02/1953. | ||
31/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1954. Dep: 11/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1955. Dep: 21/03/1955. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 25/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 08/11/1956. | ||
11/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29436 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 17/12/1957. | ||
08/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1958. Dep: 10/09/1958. | ||
27/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
09/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1960. Dep: 15/06/1960. | ||
30/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960. | ||
10/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
19/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60814 from Grantham (34F) |