|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/05/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1938 | 08/12/1938 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1940 | 04/04/1940 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1941 | 16/09/1941 | 20 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1942 | 29/04/1942 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1942 | 16/11/1942 | 60 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3109 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1947 | 01/11/1947 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 3091 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1951 | 10/05/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 55 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1952 | 23/10/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1954 | 04/03/1954 | 21 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29529 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1954 | 17/12/1954 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1957 | 15/02/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1958 | 13/06/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1959 | 17/03/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1960 | 12/11/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28062 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1961 | 11/11/1961 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1961 | 30/11/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1962 | 03/08/1962 | 5 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4779 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1706 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. | ||
10/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1938. Dep: 08/12/1938. | ||
20/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1940. Dep: 04/04/1940. | ||
28/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1941. Dep: 16/09/1941. | ||
20/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 29/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1942. Dep: 16/11/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
17/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 708 but not taken up | ||
02/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3109 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 808 | ||
22/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3091 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60808 | ||
11/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 10/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. | ||
22/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1952. Dep: 23/10/1952. | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1954. Dep: 04/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29529 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 15/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
09/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1958. Dep: 13/06/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1959. Dep: 17/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
26/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
09/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1960. Dep: 12/11/1960. | ||
01/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28062 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
25/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1961. Dep: 11/11/1961. | ||
22/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961. | ||
01/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 03/08/1962. | ||
05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60808 from Darlington (51A) | ||
15/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |