|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1938 | 07/02/1938 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1939 | 26/05/1939 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1940 | 28/07/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1942 | 17/06/1942 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1947 | 11/12/1947 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 29546 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1950 | 09/03/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck Renumbered to BR 60803 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29400 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1956 | 19/04/1956 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1958 | 07/05/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Pony truck changed |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1958 | 10/07/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1959 | 11/06/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1959 | 20/10/1959 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1960 | 30/07/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 68 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4774 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1845 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
01/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1938. Dep: 07/02/1938. | ||
11/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1939. Dep: 26/05/1939. | ||
25/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1940. Dep: 28/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1942. Dep: 17/06/1942. | ||
28/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
16/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. | ||
23/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 703 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 803 | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 11/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29546 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 09/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck Renumbered to BR 60803 |
||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29400 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
28/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1956. Dep: 19/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 07/05/1958. Work undertaken: Pony truck changed |
||
30/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 10/07/1958. | ||
06/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1959. Dep: 11/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1959. Dep: 20/10/1959. | ||
14/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
29/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60803 from New England (34E) | ||
28/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |