|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1936 | 16/11/1936 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1937 | 10/03/1938 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1940 | 15/02/1940 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1941 | 11/06/1941 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1942 | 23/09/1942 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1943 | 08/09/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 8931 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 26 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2958 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1949 | 21/05/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60802 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1953 | 05/02/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1955 | 23/07/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1955 | 08/08/1955 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/02/1957 | 05/02/1957 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1957 | 17/05/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1958 | 01/08/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1959 | 06/02/1959 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/02/1959 | 25/02/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1959 | 07/07/1959 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1960 | 02/03/1960 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1961 | 17/08/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29407 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1964 | 13/02/1964 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
01/02/1964 | Branch line news (Works Yard) | Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4773 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1843 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
10/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1936. Dep: 16/11/1936. | ||
15/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1937. Dep: 10/03/1938. | ||
18/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. | ||
12/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1940. Dep: 15/02/1940. | ||
24/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1941. Dep: 11/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1942. Dep: 23/09/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1943. Dep: 08/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8931 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. | ||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2958 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 702 but not taken up | ||
13/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 802 | ||
09/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. | ||
05/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60802 |
||
25/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
05/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 05/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. | ||
20/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1955. Dep: 23/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 08/08/1955. | ||
15/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
04/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1957. Dep: 05/02/1957. | ||
11/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1957. Dep: 17/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
28/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 01/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. | ||
02/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 06/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 25/02/1959. | ||
07/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 07/07/1959. | ||
02/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1960. Dep: 02/03/1960. | ||
26/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1961. Dep: 17/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29407 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
21/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
13/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/02/1964. Dep: 13/02/1964. | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
05/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60802 from St Margarets (64A) |