|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/00/1915 | 11/12/1915 | General | Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1920 | 23/10/1920 | 148 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1924 | 25/10/1924 | 144 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3450 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1927 | 24/08/1927 | 91 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1930 | 05/04/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8047 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 450 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1240 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
07/00/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/00/1915. Dep: 11/12/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
29/05/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1920. Dep: 23/10/1920. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 |
||
04/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3450 |
||
26/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1927. Dep: 24/08/1927. | ||
01/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8047 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
15/06/1933 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3450 from Colwick (CLK) |