Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
441 |
m/e |
12/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3441 |
|
15/01/1925 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1906 |
Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1575) |
25/01/1919 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7345) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
1919 |
25/01/1919 |
|
General |
Boiler number 7345 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
29/04/1921 |
15/10/1921 |
170 days |
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
16/09/1924 |
15/01/1925 |
122 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3441
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
06/07/1925 |
21/07/1925 |
16 days |
Light Repair |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
29/12/1928 |
09/02/1929 |
43 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 441 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1139 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 25/01/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7345 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
29/04/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921. |
|
|
16/09/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1924. Dep: 15/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3441
|
|
|
06/07/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1925. Dep: 21/07/1925. |
|
|
16/09/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
29/12/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. |
|
|
11/06/1930 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3441 from Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|