|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 19/08/1911 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1542 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1920 | 30/04/1921 | 150 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1924 | 26/09/1924 | 150 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3416 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1926 | 05/02/1927 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 7132 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1929 | 21/09/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1932 | 17/12/1932 | 29 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 416 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 985 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 19/08/1911. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1542 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
02/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1920. Dep: 30/04/1921. | ||
30/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1924. Dep: 26/09/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3416 |
||
11/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1926. Dep: 05/02/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7132 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
10/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929. | ||
19/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932. | ||
17/12/1935 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3416 from Colwick (CLK) |