|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/1909 | General | Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 02/1909 | General | Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 04/1914 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 04/1914 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1398 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1920 | 20/11/1920 | 213 days | General | Boiler number 7342 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1924 | 11/10/1924 | 152 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3414 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1927 | 26/11/1927 | 295 days | General | Boiler number 8047 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 414 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 978 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
02/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
02/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
04/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1914. | ||
04/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1914. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1398 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
22/04/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1920. Dep: 20/11/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7342 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
13/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3414 |
||
05/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8047 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
31/12/1929 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3414 from Colwick (CLK) |