|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/1909 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 07/1909 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 17/10/1914 | General | Boiler number 1397 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1919 | 07/02/1920 | 121 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1923 | 08/09/1923 | 116 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 404N |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1926 | 26/06/1926 | 107 days | General | Boiler number 7836 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 404 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 972 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
07/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/07/1909. | ||
07/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/07/1909. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 17/10/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1397 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
10/10/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1919. Dep: 07/02/1920. | ||
16/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1923. Dep: 08/09/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 404N |
||
30/03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3404 | ||
12/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1926. Dep: 26/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7836 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
02/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
30/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
26/04/1929 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3404 from New England (NWE) |