|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 16/06/1923 | 21/06/1923 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1923 | 20/11/1923 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/04/1925 | 07/08/1925 | 103 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/08/1929 | 04/10/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1932 | 16/01/1933 | 67 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1935 | 27/11/1935 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1939 | 21/06/1939 | 65 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1940 | 04/08/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1940 | 13/08/1940 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1943 | 27/04/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/05/1945 | 25/05/1945 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3462 |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/04/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 40 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63462 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1949 | 16/12/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1953 | 05/03/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1954 | 11/08/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1956 | 25/04/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24052 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1960 | 02/12/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24100 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1962 | 08/11/1962 | 14 days | Unclassified | Complete AWS fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 903 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1923. Dep: 21/06/1923. | ||
18/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1923. Dep: 20/11/1923. | ||
27/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1925. Dep: 07/08/1925. | ||
02/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1929. Dep: 04/10/1929. | ||
11/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/11/1932. Dep: 16/01/1933. | ||
08/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 27/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1939. Dep: 21/06/1939. | ||
08/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1940. Dep: 04/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1940. Dep: 13/08/1940. | ||
22/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1943. Dep: 27/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1945. Dep: 25/05/1945. | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3462 |
||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63462 |
||
15/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A) |
||
19/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A) |
||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953. | ||
04/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1954. Dep: 11/08/1954. | ||
19/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 25/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24052 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
08/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
24/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1960. Dep: 02/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24100 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1962. Dep: 08/11/1962. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fitted |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63462 from Tyne Dock (52H) |