|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/08/1923 | 27/10/1923 | 67 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/04/1926 | 16/07/1926 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1928 | 07/08/1928 | 56 days | General | Boiler number D806 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1930 | 05/08/1930 | 79 days | General | Boiler number E4/49 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1933 | 28/06/1933 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1935 | 13/11/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1937 | 18/03/1937 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1937 | 02/12/1937 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1944 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1940 | 19/03/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1944 | 27/01/1945 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1945 | 15/02/1945 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/04/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3145 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1947 | 28/01/1947 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/05/1948 | 31/05/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63402 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1950 | 13/04/1950 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24221 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24309 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1958 | 17/12/1958 | 41 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1961 | 30/03/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1961 | 07/04/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2245 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
22/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923. | ||
1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
16/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1926. Dep: 16/07/1926. | ||
13/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1928. Dep: 07/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D806 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1930. Dep: 05/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/49 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
29/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1933. Dep: 28/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1935. Dep: 13/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/02/1937. Dep: 18/03/1937. | ||
22/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1937. Dep: 02/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1944 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
20/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1940. Dep: 19/03/1940. | ||
11/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1944. Dep: 27/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1945. Dep: 15/02/1945. | ||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
01/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3402 | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3145 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 28/01/1947. | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
09/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1948. Dep: 31/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63402 |
||
09/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1950. Dep: 13/04/1950. | ||
27/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24221 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24309 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1958. Dep: 17/12/1958. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
21/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1961. Dep: 30/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1961. Dep: 07/04/1961. | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
16/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63402 from Blyth (North) (52F) |