|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/12/1922 | 21/04/1923 | 122 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1925 | 07/09/1925 | 110 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1926 | 14/01/1927 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D146 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1928 | 19/09/1928 | 73 days | General | Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1931 | 30/06/1931 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D916 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1934 | 18/05/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D699 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1937 | 16/03/1937 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1938 | 24/10/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1939 | 11/01/1940 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1942 | 12/03/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1965 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1947 | 14/02/1947 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/05/1948 | 01/06/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63383 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1949 | 27/10/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1952 | 16/01/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24242 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1953 | 27/01/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1955 | 21/10/1955 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1955 | 03/11/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1958 | 11/06/1958 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24160 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2226 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
21/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1922. Dep: 21/04/1923. | ||
21/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1925. Dep: 07/09/1925. | ||
07/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1926. Dep: 14/01/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D146 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1928. Dep: 19/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D951 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
22/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1931. Dep: 30/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D916 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1934. Dep: 18/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D699 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1937. Dep: 16/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1938. Dep: 24/10/1938. | ||
23/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1939. Dep: 11/01/1940. | ||
09/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1942. Dep: 12/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1965 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3383 | ||
27/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 14/02/1947. | ||
23/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1948. Dep: 01/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63383 |
||
28/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 27/10/1949. | ||
10/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1952. Dep: 16/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24242 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1953. Dep: 27/01/1953. | ||
27/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1955. Dep: 21/10/1955. | ||
29/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1955. Dep: 03/11/1955. | ||
15/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1958. Dep: 11/06/1958. | ||
26/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24160 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63383 from West Hartlepool (51C) |